MD HB36 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring, by October 1, 2022, a producer of certain packaging, containers, and paper products to individually or as part of a stewardship organization submit a covered materials and products stewardship plan to the Department of the Environment for approval; prohibiting, on or after a October 1, 2024, a producer of covered materials and products from selling or distributing covered materials and products unless the producer individually or as part of a stewardship organization has an approved stewardship plan; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environment – Packaging, Containers, and Paper Products – Producer Responsibility

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
2020-10-15HousePre-filed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Environment92301(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment92302(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment92303(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment92304(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment92305(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment92306(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment92307(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment92308(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback