MD HB358 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB316
Note: Carry Over of previous HB389
Note: Carry Over of previous HB389
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-12 - Referred Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-12 - Referred Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing an income tax checkoff for voluntary contributions to the Maryland Veterans Trust Fund; requiring the Comptroller to include a checkoff on the individual income tax return; requiring the Comptroller to collect and account for contributions made through the checkoff and to credit the proceeds to the Fund after deducting the amount necessary to administer the checkoff; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2020; etc.
Title
Income Tax Checkoff - Maryland Veterans Trust Fund
Sponsors
Del. C.T. Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-12 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2021-02-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-6) |
2021-02-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-04 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2020-12-22 | House | Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m. |
2020-12-22 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-12-22 | House | Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2020-10-30 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB358 (Carry Over) 2021-02-12 - Referred Budget and Taxation
SB241 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-18 - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
HB389 (Carry Over) 2020-02-19 - Referred Budget and Taxation
SB241 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-18 - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
HB389 (Carry Over) 2020-02-19 - Referred Budget and Taxation
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 9 | 913 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 10 | 804 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 2 | 116 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |