MD HB356 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-05 - Hearing 4/5 at 1:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-05 - Hearing 4/5 at 1:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that the owner of a rental vehicle may satisfy a specified insurance requirement by maintaining a specified security that is secondary to any other valid and collectible coverage; requiring the owner of a rental vehicle to provide a specified notice to the renter of the rental vehicle; etc.
Title
Transportation - Required Security - Rental Vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-26 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | Hearing 4/5 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-04-05 | Re-referred Finance | |
2012-03-26 | First Reading Senate Rules | |
2012-03-26 | Third Reading Passed (99-33) | |
2012-03-25 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-25 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-28 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-02-07 | Hearing 3/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-07 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-01 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-30 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Disclosure
Leases and Rent
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Contracts
Disclosure
Leases and Rent
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Notices