MD HB355 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 541
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing the requirement that certain county boards of education develop and maintain a funding accountability website; requiring that each county board report annually certain financial information to the Department of Budget and Management beginning January 1, 2020; requiring the Department to post certain information provided by each county board on its Funding Accountability & Transparency website; providing the Act may not be construed to require the disclosure of certain confidential information; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education – County Boards of Education – Disclosures and Requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (31-15) (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 541
2019-04-08HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2019-04-08HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (31-15)
2019-04-08SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-08SenateFavorable with Amendments {864435/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-08SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-22SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-15SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2019-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {705660/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-02-15HouseHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-13HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-07HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04HouseReassigned to Ways and Means
2019-01-31HouseHearing canceled
2019-01-29HouseHearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-28HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0355&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0355f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0355t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0355e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_541_hb0355e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0355_70566001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0355_86443501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0005/hb0355.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0355_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0481.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0355_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1599.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1412.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback