MD HB353 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 711
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 711
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the maximum amount, from $16,000,000 to $20,000,000, of user fees the Maryland Health Care Commission may assess against hospitals, nursing homes, payors, and health care practitioners to cover the actual documented direct costs of fulfilling the statutory and regulatory duties of the Commission.
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission – User Fee Assessments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 41 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 41 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 711 |
2022-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (30-16) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2022-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (94-41) |
2022-03-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-07 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-01-28 | House | Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-01-19 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB253 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 712
Subjects
Assessments
Fees
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Nursing Homes
Fees
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Nursing Homes
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 19 | 111 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |