MD HB35 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-18 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-18 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an opioid maintenance therapy program to have a medical director who is a physician and has 2 years of experience providing services to individuals who are addicted to alcohol or other drugs, including at least 1 year of experience in the treatment of opioid addiction with opioid maintenance therapy; etc.
Title
Public Health - Opioid Maintenance Therapy Programs - Medical Director Requirement and Qualifications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-18 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2019-02-13 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2018-10-18 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Opioids
Physicians
Public Health
Substance Abuse
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Opioids
Physicians
Public Health
Substance Abuse