MD HB346 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the Advisory Committee on the Naming of State Facilities, Roads, and Bridges and other related provisions of law.
Title
Advisory Committee on the Naming of State Facilities, Roads, and Bridges -
Sponsors
Del. Tom Hucker [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | |
2010-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2010-04-01 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-05 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-22 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-31 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-19 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | |
2010-03-17 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-17 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-03-16 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2010-02-12 | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-12 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-02-12 | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-11 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-27 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |