MD HB343 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the hours of sale for a Class B Cafe licensee in Harford County.
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hours of Sale for Class B Licensees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2013-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2013-03-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {703098/1 Adopted |
2013-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2013-02-25 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-25 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Harford County
Restaurants
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Harford County
Restaurants