MD HB337 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-30 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-30 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governing body of Baltimore County to grant, by law, a property tax credit against the county property tax imposed on a dwelling that is located in a revitalization district and is owned by a homeowner who, on or after June 1, 2016, made specified substantial improvements to the dwelling that cause the dwelling to be reassessed at a higher value; requiring the credit to equal the amount of the county property tax attributable to the improvements made to the property multiplied by a specified percentage; etc.
Title
Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Revitalization Districts
Sponsors
Del. Bob Long [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2016-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {175467/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2016-02-17 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-27 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Assessments
Baltimore County
Community Development
Housing
Laws and Ordinances
Property Tax
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Baltimore County
Community Development
Housing
Laws and Ordinances
Property Tax
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local