MD HB330 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB434
Note: Carry Over of previous HB129
Note: Carry Over of previous HB129
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-05 - Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-05 - Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the conditions under which a lawsuit is considered a strategic lawsuit against public participation (SLAPP suit); altering the conditions under which a defendant in a SLAPP suit is not civilly liable for certain communications; establishing certain standards and requirements relating to a motion to dismiss an alleged SLAPP suit; and applying the Act prospectively.
Title
Courts - Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m. |
2024-02-05 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-23 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-17 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB330 (Carry Over) 2024-02-05 - Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m.
HB129 (Carry Over) 2023-03-03 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
SB568 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-31 - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
HB129 (Carry Over) 2023-03-03 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
SB568 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-31 - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Attorneys' Fees
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Civil Rights and Social Equity
Court Costs
Courts
defendants
Evidence
Liability
Libel and Slander
Testimony
Unfair Trade Practices
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Civil Rights and Social Equity
Court Costs
Courts
defendants
Evidence
Liability
Libel and Slander
Testimony
Unfair Trade Practices
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 5 | 807 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0330?ys=2024RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/bills/hb/hb0330f.pdf |