MD HB328 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 76
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 76
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "qualified Maryland biotechnology company" for purposes of the biotechnology investment tax credit to include a company that has been in active business no longer than 10 years from the date the company first received a qualified investment; and applying the Act to initial tax credit certificates issued after June 30, 2013.
Title
Biotechnology Investment Tax Credit - Qualified Maryland Biotechnology Company - Definition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (114-23) (Y: 114 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (108-29) (Y: 108 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (108-29) (Y: 108 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 76 |
2013-04-04 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2013-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (114-23) |
2013-04-04 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {509437/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 2:00 p.m. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2013-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (108-29) |
2013-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {685267/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2013-02-26 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-24 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |