MD HB328 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that, after the death of a minor or disabled person for whom a guardian of the property has been appointed, the guardian of the property of the minor or disabled person pay from the estate all commissions, fees, and expenses shown on the court-approved final guardianship account and retain the balance of the estate for delivery to an appointed personal representative of the decedent or other person entitled to it.
Title
Estates and Trusts - Guardianship - Payment of Expenses After Death of Ward
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-03-31 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-31 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-02 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-02-26 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-03-30 | Returned Passed | |
2010-02-25 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | |
2010-02-23 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-02-23 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-02-22 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-27 | First Reading Judiciary |