MD HB327 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-8)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 572
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering a subtraction modification under the State income tax for certain military retirement income for individuals who are at least a certain age; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement Income

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 572
2018-04-07HousePassed Enrolled
2018-04-07HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2018-04-07HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
2018-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {339836/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2018-03-28SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2018-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {615568/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-02-28HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-05HouseHearing canceled
2018-02-07HouseHearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-22HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0327&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0327f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0327t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0327e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_572_hb0327e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0007/hb0327_61556801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0007/hb0327_33983601.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0007/hb0327.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0327_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0544.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0327_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1215.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1327.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback