MD HB324 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing 7 days, not to exceed 56 hours, of personal leave to each employee in the State Personnel Management System, except a temporary employee, during each calendar year that is a leap year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Personnel - Leap Year - Personal Leave

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (96-40) (Y: 96 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26HouseVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
2017-03-30HouseReturned Passed
2017-03-29SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading Passed
2017-03-28SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2017-03-27SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2017-03-23SenateHearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-03-03SenateFirst Reading Finance
2017-03-02HouseThird Reading Passed (96-40)
2017-02-28HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-02-28HouseFavorable with Amendments {414663/1 Report Adopted
2017-02-27HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2017-02-14HouseHearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-01-25HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0324&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2017rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0324f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0324t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0324_41466301.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/fnotes/bil_0004/hb0324.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0324_app.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0324_fin.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/veto_letters/hb0324.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0324,h-0231&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0324,s-0915&stab=02&ys=2017RS

Bill Comments

feedback