MD HB320 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 33
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 33
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing an individual for whom special registration plates for individuals with disabilities are issued to park in a designated zone for the handicapped established by Baltimore County on any county road, subject to a restriction.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates for Individuals with Disabilities - Parking in Baltimore County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (128-2) (Y: 128 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (128-2) (Y: 128 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 33 |
2013-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-25 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-2) |
2013-03-21 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments {960710/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-24 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Baltimore County
Counties - Local Laws
Disabilities
License Plates
Parking
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Counties - Local Laws
Disabilities
License Plates
Parking
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration