MD HB312 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from causing a financing statement to be filed or recorded with a filing office under specified circumstances; requiring a filing office to accept for filing a financing statement that meets specified requirements and send a specified notice in a specified manner to specified persons under specified circumstances; authorizing a specified person to submit a specified affidavit stating specified information; requiring a filing office to send a specified notice if the filing office receives a specified affidavit; etc.
Title
Commercial Law - Secured Transactions - False Financing Statements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2015-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2015-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2015-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {323397/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2015-02-18 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-05 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Circuit Courts
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Generally
Consumer Protection
Court Costs
Damages
Fees
Financial Institutions
Forms
Fraud
Liens
Notices
Petitions
Postal Service
Recordation
Records
Rules and Regulations
Security Interests
Circuit Courts
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Generally
Consumer Protection
Court Costs
Damages
Fees
Financial Institutions
Forms
Fraud
Liens
Notices
Petitions
Postal Service
Recordation
Records
Rules and Regulations
Security Interests