MD HB310 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Third Reading Passed (110-28)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the University of Maryland, Baltimore to study the health effects of air traffic noise on communities near Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport since the implementation of the Next Generation Air Transportation System; requiring the study to evaluate health outcomes, and certain costs; requiring the Governor to provide in the 2022 budget bill at least $100,000 for the study; requiring a report be submitted by September 1, 2022, to the Governor, the General Assembly, and certain county executives and councils; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

University of Maryland, Baltimore - Study on the Health Effects of Air Traffic Noise

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20HouseThird Reading Passed (110-28)
2020-02-18HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-02-18HouseFavorable with Amendments {494760/1 Adopted
2020-02-17HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2020-01-28HouseHearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-28HouseHearing canceled
2020-01-24HouseHearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-20HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Same As/Similar To

SB184 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-19 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback