MD HB254 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB310
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the University of Maryland, Baltimore to study the health effects of air traffic noise on communities near Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport since the implementation of the Next Generation Air Transportation System; requiring the study to evaluate health outcomes and certain costs; requiring the Governor to provide in the 2023 budget bill at least $100,000 for the study; requiring a report be submitted by September 1, 2023, to the Governor, the General Assembly, and certain county executives and councils; etc.
Title
University of Maryland, Baltimore - Study on the Health Effects of Air Traffic Noise
Sponsors
Del. Terri Hill [D] | Del. Jessica Feldmark [D] | Del. Eric Ebersole [D] | Del. Mark Chang [D] |
Del. Jen Terrasa [D] | Del. Heather Bagnall [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2020-09-22 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB310 (Carry Over) 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Aircraft
Airports
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Budgets
Governor
Health
Investigations and Inquiries
Medical Research
Noise
Public Health
Records
Reports
State Universities and Colleges
Transportation - Generally
Aircraft
Airports
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Budgets
Governor
Health
Investigations and Inquiries
Medical Research
Noise
Public Health
Records
Reports
State Universities and Colleges
Transportation - Generally