MD HB31 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-19 - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Hearing: Feb 3 @ 1:00 pm House Economic Matters Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Resiliency Hub Grant Program in the Maryland Energy Administration; requiring the Administration to establish certain procedures and criteria for the Program; establishing the Resiliency Hub Grant Program Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; requiring interest earnings of the Resiliency Hub Grant Program Fund to be credited to the Resiliency Hub Grant Program Fund; requiring that certain fines and penalties be credited to the Resiliency Hub Grant Program Fund rather than the General Fund of the State; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Energy Administration – Resiliency Hub Grant Program and Fund

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-19HouseHearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2022-01-12HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2021-10-18HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB256 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-17 - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities13201(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities2110.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities7306.2(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement6226(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government92010(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government92011(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government920B-05(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback