MD HB31 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - Third Reading Passed (29-16)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - Third Reading Passed (29-16)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing certain surcharges on certain fees, charges, and costs in certain civil cases in the circuit courts and the District Court; requiring that certain surcharges collected be deposited into the Maryland Legal Services Corporation Fund and directed to certain special funds in the State; establishing the Rental Assistance Special Fund to provide funding to nonprofit organizations that work in the area of rent assistance to pay the back rent for individuals facing a potential residential rental property eviction; etc.
Title
Courts - Surcharges and Payment to Special Funds - Prohibited Lease Provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 29 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Question is on the Appeal from a decision of the Chair Rejected (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Motion Limit Debate (Senator King) Adopted (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator West) Rejected (Y: 20 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 80 N: 48 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Question is on the Appeal from a decision of the Chair Rejected (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Motion Limit Debate (Senator King) Adopted (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator West) Rejected (Y: 20 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 80 N: 48 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (29-16) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Floor Amendment {103829/1 (Senator West) Rejected |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {638676/1 Adopted |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Question is on the Appeal from a decision of the Chair Rejected (31-15) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Motion Limit Debate (Senator King) Adopted (32-15) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator West) Rejected (20-27) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {638676/1 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (80-48) |
2021-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {762710/1 Adopted |
2021-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2021-01-26 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2020-10-30 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Courts
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
District Courts
Fees
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Interest
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Legal Aid
Revenue and Taxes
Civil Actions
Courts
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
District Courts
Fees
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Interest
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Legal Aid
Revenue and Taxes
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 7 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 7 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |