MD HB309 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 761
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 761
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a certain provision of law requiring the Maryland Office of Minority Health and Health Disparities to collaborate with the Maryland Health Care Commission to publish a report card that includes racial and ethnic composition data on individuals who hold a license or certificate issued by a health occupations board, rather than only physicians; requiring the Office, as permitted by certain privacy laws, to respond to requests for health data that includes race and ethnicity information within 30 days of receipt of the request; etc.
Title
Public Health - Data - Race and Ethnicity Information
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 761 |
2021-04-12 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-6) |
2021-03-11 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-10 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-12-23 | House | Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2020-09-21 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB565 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 762
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Data
Demographics
Ethnic Affairs
Examinations
Forms
Health
Health Care Commission
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Licenses
meetings
Minorities
Public Health
Public Officials
Publications
Records
Reports
Time
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Data
Demographics
Ethnic Affairs
Examinations
Forms
Health
Health Care Commission
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Licenses
meetings
Minorities
Public Health
Public Officials
Publications
Records
Reports
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 20 | 1004 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 20 | 1005 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 1 | 225 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |