MD HB309 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 70
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 70
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governing body of Anne Arundel County, after consultation with the State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners, to adopt ordinances or regulations relating to verification, inspection, and display of certain licenses issued under certain provisions of law; and requiring the governing body of Anne Arundel County to provide that the Anne Arundel County Health Officer and the Anne Arundel County Police Department have the authority to carry out the ordinances or regulations adopted under certain provisions of law.
Title
Anne Arundel County - Practice of Massage - Regulation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 70 |
2018-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2018-02-21 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-02-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments {916184/1 Report Adopted |
2018-02-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-25 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-22 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Anne Arundel County
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
County Administrators
Health Occupations
Inspections
Law Enforcement
Laws and Ordinances
Licenses
Massage
Notices
Rules and Regulations
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
County Administrators
Health Occupations
Inspections
Law Enforcement
Laws and Ordinances
Licenses
Massage
Notices
Rules and Regulations