MD HB3 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1219
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-05 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-05 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering, from 15 years to 20 years or the equivalent of 20 years considering certain allowances, the time period that inmates sentenced to life imprisonment for a crime committed on or after October 1, 2021, must serve before becoming eligible for parole consideration; repealing certain provisions that provide that inmates serving a term of life imprisonment may be paroled only with the Governor's approval, subject to certain provisions; repealing certain provisions that require certain parole decisions be sent to the Governor; etc.
Title
Correctional Services - Parole - Life Imprisonment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 93 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - Floor Amendment 423127/1 (Delegate Parrott) Rejected (Y: 40 N: 91 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-03-03 - House - Floor Amendment 893926/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (Y: 38 N: 94 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-03-03 - House - Floor Amendment 563322/1 (Delegate Chisholm) Rejected (Y: 41 N: 91 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-03-03 - House - Floor Amendment 423127/1 (Delegate Parrott) Rejected (Y: 40 N: 91 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-03-03 - House - Floor Amendment 893926/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (Y: 38 N: 94 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-03-03 - House - Floor Amendment 563322/1 (Delegate Chisholm) Rejected (Y: 41 N: 91 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (93-41) |
2021-03-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-03 | House | Floor Amendment {423127/1 (Delegate Parrott) Rejected (40-91) |
2021-03-03 | House | Floor Amendment {893926/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (38-94) |
2021-03-03 | House | Floor Amendment {563322/1 (Delegate Chisholm) Rejected (41-91) |
2021-03-03 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2021-02-26 | House | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted |
2021-02-26 | House | Favorable |
2021-02-25 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2020-12-23 | House | Hearing 1/18 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2020-10-08 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB1219 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Correctional Services | 4 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Correctional Services | 7 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |