MD HB1219 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering, from 15 years to 20 years, the time period that certain inmates sentenced to life imprisonment for a crime committed on or after October 1, 2020, must serve before becoming eligible for parole consideration; repealing certain provisions that provide that inmates serving a term of life imprisonment may be paroled only with the Governor's approval, subject to certain provisions; repealing certain provisions that require certain parole decisions to be transmitted to the Governor under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Correctional Services - Parole - Life Imprisonment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 89 N: 38 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - Floor Amendment 723424/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (Y: 39 N: 93 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-15SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (89-38)
2020-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-13HouseFloor Amendment {723424/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (39-93)
2020-03-13HouseMotion Special Order until End Of This Calendar (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
2020-03-12HouseMotion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
2020-03-12HouseFavorable Adopted
2020-03-12HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

SB817 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-06 - Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Correctional Services4305(n/a)See Bill Text
Correctional Services7301(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback