MD HB3 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 28
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 28
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the types of motor vehicle liability insurers that may exclude coverage to operators providing transportation network services; prohibiting a person from operating a transportation network company in the State without a permit from the Public Service Commission; providing that before December 15, 2016, the Commission may not require an applicant for a for-hire driver's license or transportation network operator's license to comply with a specified criminal history records check; etc.
Title
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services and For-Hire Transportation - Clarifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 28 |
2016-03-31 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2016-03-31 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2016-03-31 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0) |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {597276/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2016-02-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (141-0) |
2016-01-28 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-01-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments {993391/1 Report Adopted |
2016-01-27 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2016-01-21 | House | Hearing 1/21 at 3:00 p.m. |
2016-01-20 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-01-21 | House | Hearing 1/21 at 2:00 p.m. |
2016-01-13 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2015-11-03 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Assessments
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Consumer Protection
Counties
Criminal Background Investigations
Disclosure
Drivers' Licenses
Emergency Bills
Equipment
For-Hire Driving
Hearings
Inspections
Insurance
Interstate Affairs
Jurisdiction
Liability
Licenses
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Public Service Commission
Records
Revenue and Taxes
Tax Court, Maryland
Taxicabs
Transportation
Utility Regulation
Assessments
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Consumer Protection
Counties
Criminal Background Investigations
Disclosure
Drivers' Licenses
Emergency Bills
Equipment
For-Hire Driving
Hearings
Inspections
Insurance
Interstate Affairs
Jurisdiction
Liability
Licenses
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Public Service Commission
Records
Revenue and Taxes
Tax Court, Maryland
Taxicabs
Transportation
Utility Regulation