MD HB298 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 219
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 219
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adding a licensed clinical professional art therapist to the types of licensed clinical counselors and therapists whose services entitle an insured or specified other persons to reimbursement, under specified circumstances, under specified health insurance policies, contracts, or certificates.
Title
Health Insurance - Licensed Clinical Professional Art Therapists - Reimbursement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 219 |
2017-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2017-02-24 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2017-02-22 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-02-22 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-21 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2017-02-09 | House | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-25 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Contracts
Counselors
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance - Health
Licenses
Mental and Behavioral Health
Reimbursement Rates
Social Workers
Contracts
Counselors
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance - Health
Licenses
Mental and Behavioral Health
Reimbursement Rates
Social Workers