MD HB296 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-17 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting the Maryland Transportation Authority from charging a toll at a toll plaza adjacent to a bridge that is a transportation facilities project for a vehicle that does not traverse the bridge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Transportation Authority - Vehicle Not Using Bridge - Toll Prohibited

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-17HouseUnfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2016-02-18HouseHearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-02-04HouseHearing cancelled
2016-02-11HouseHearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
2016-01-26HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback