MD HB296 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 84
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing and empowering the County Commissioners of Carroll County, from time to time, to borrow not more than $17,000,000 in order to finance the construction, improvement, or development of specified public facilities in Carroll County, and to effect such borrowing by the issuance and sale at public or private sale of its general obligation bonds; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-14HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 84
2015-03-31HouseReturned Passed
2015-03-30SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2015-03-27SenateSecond Reading Passed
2015-03-27SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2015-03-26SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2015-03-25SenateHearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-03-06SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2015-03-05HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2015-03-03HouseSecond Reading Passed
2015-03-03HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2015-03-02HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2015-02-24HouseHearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-02-18HouseHearing cancelled
2015-02-17HouseHearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-02-04HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback