MD HB280 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB179
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 631
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 631
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "recyclable materials" under the Maryland Recycling Act to exclude incinerator ash; and repealing the authority of a county to utilize a resource recovery facility to meet 5% of the waste reduction required to be achieved through recycling in the county's recycling plan.
Title
Maryland Recycling Act - Recyclable Materials and Resource Recovery Facilities - Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 631 |
2021-04-12 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (99-39) |
2021-03-09 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-08 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-01-26 | House | Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters |
2020-08-28 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB304 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-05 - Referred Environment and Transportation Economic Matters
HB179 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
HB179 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 9 | 1701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 1703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |