MD HB275 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 147
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 147
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the requirement that certain revenue collected by Prince George's County as a result of violations recorded by speed monitoring systems on Maryland Route 210 (Indian Head Highway) be deposited into the Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund and requiring that the revenue be credited to the State Highway Administration to be used solely for certain safety-related purposes related to Maryland Route 210 in Prince George's County; and repealing a certain funding source for the Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund.
Title
Prince George's County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Maryland Route 210 (Indian Head Highway) PG 306-20
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 126 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 126 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 147 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (126-5) |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-25 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-20 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Criminal Injuries Compensation
Electronic Surveillance
Prince George's County
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
State Highway Administration
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Video
Electronic Surveillance
Prince George's County
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
State Highway Administration
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Video
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 7 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 11 | 819 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 21 | 809 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |