MD HB275 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 108
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 108
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the St. Mary's County Metropolitan Commission to offer a contract of employment for certain positions; altering certain requirements and procedures concerning the incurrence of debt by the Commission; altering certain requirements concerning a certain annual tax levied by the Commission; altering certain procurement requirements; authorizing the Commission to offer connection incentive programs and other financing mechanisms to owners of existing residential properties for water and sewer improvements; etc.
Title
St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 108 |
2018-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {190117/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-02-13 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-19 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Counties - Local Laws
County and Baltimore City Bonds
Debt Collection
Fees
Financial Institutions
Notices
Procurement
Public Local Laws
Real Property
Reimbursement Rates
Revenue and Taxes
Sanitary Districts
Sewage
St. Mary's County
Water
Work, Labor and Employment
Counties - Local Laws
County and Baltimore City Bonds
Debt Collection
Fees
Financial Institutions
Notices
Procurement
Public Local Laws
Real Property
Reimbursement Rates
Revenue and Taxes
Sanitary Districts
Sewage
St. Mary's County
Water
Work, Labor and Employment