MD HB271 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the purposes of the Disaster Relief Housing Program in the Department of Housing and Community Development; and authorizing the Department to continue to provide specified financial assistance after the expiration of a state of emergency.
Title
Housing and Community Development - Disaster Relief Housing Program
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2012-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-30 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2012-03-27 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-03-07 | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-02 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-01 | Third Reading Passed (131-0) | |
2012-02-28 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-02-28 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-02-27 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2012-01-30 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-27 | First Reading Environmental Matters |