MD HB267 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1380
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-14 - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-14 - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from making or sending a threat to a public health official with the intent to intimidate, interfere with, or impede a public health official from performing the official's duties; and providing that a person who violated the Act is guilty of a misdemeanor and subject to imprisonment of up to 90 days and a fine of up to $500, or both.
Title
Criminal Law - Threat Against Public Health Official or Hospital Staff Member
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-14 | House | Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB1380 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
SB298 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-20 - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
SB298 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-20 - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Emergency Bills
Health Occupations
Penalties and Sentences
Public Health
Public Officials
Threats
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Emergency Bills
Health Occupations
Penalties and Sentences
Public Health
Public Officials
Threats
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 3 | 708.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0267?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/hb/hb0267f.pdf |