MD HB266 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB128
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Referred Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Referred Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Converting enhanced underinsured motorist coverage from an opt-in offering of coverage into an opt-out coverage option under provisions of law establishing requirements for private passenger motor vehicle liability insurance.
Title
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance – Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage – Opt–Out Option
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2022-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (96-39) |
2022-03-09 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-08 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2022-01-27 | House | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-27 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-01-19 | House | Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-13 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
HB266 (Carry Over) 2022-03-14 - Referred Finance
SB301 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-22 - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
SB301 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-22 - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Communications
Contracts
Forms
Insurance - Other than Health
Laws and Ordinances
Liability
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Contracts
Forms
Insurance - Other than Health
Laws and Ordinances
Liability
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Insurance | 19 | 509 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 19 | 509.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 19 | 510 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 19 | 511 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 19 | 511.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |