MD HB26 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-19 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting private education lenders and private education loan collectors from initiating a certain action except under certain circumstances; prohibiting a court from entering a certain judgment unless the private education lender or private education loan collector introduces certain documents; providing that the failure of a private education lender or private education loan collector to provide certain information at a certain time constitutes an unfair, abusive, or deceptive trade practice; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-19SenateHearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-03-18SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2021-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (130-3)
2021-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {714868/1 Adopted
2021-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2021-01-04HouseHearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m. (Appropriations)
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Appropriations and Judiciary
2020-10-29HousePre-filed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Courts and Judicial Proceedings51301(n/a)See Bill Text
Courts and Judicial Proceedings51302(n/a)See Bill Text
Courts and Judicial Proceedings51303(n/a)See Bill Text
Courts and Judicial Proceedings51304(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback