MD HB111 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB26

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-05 - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting private education lenders and private education loan collectors from initiating a certain action unless the private education lenders or private education loan collectors possess certain documents; requiring a private education lender or private education loan collector to introduce certain information in a certain action; and requiring a private education loan collector to provide certain information to a student loan borrower in a certain communication and on request of the student loan borrower.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-05HouseHearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
2022-01-12HouseFirst Reading Appropriations and Judiciary
2021-10-19HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB26 (Carry Over) 2021-03-19 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Courts and Judicial Proceedings51301(n/a)See Bill Text
Courts and Judicial Proceedings51302(n/a)See Bill Text
Courts and Judicial Proceedings51303(n/a)See Bill Text
Courts and Judicial Proceedings51304(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback