MD HB258 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 29 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Clarifying that certain provisions of law apply to managed care organizations; requiring a managed care organization to pay a certain fee in certain calendar years; altering the purpose of provisions of law requiring that certain entities be subject to a certain assessment on certain amounts; requiring that certain entities be subject to certain assessments in certain calendar years; clarifying that certain assessments are for insurance products subject to certain provisions of federal law and may be subject to a State assessment; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Insurance - Individual Market Stabilization - Provider Fee

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (40-7) (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (97-37) (Y: 98 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseReturned Passed
2019-03-28SenateThird Reading Passed (40-7)
2019-03-27SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-27SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-25SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (97-37)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15HouseFloor Amendment {773425/1 (Delegate Cullison) Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {746281/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-02-01HouseHearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-25HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback