MD HB255 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the actions with regard to which hospitals and related institutions are prohibited from discriminating against individuals on certain grounds to include the treatment or procedure sought by the individual under certain circumstances; altering the characteristics of an individual on the basis of which hospitals and related institutions are prohibited from discriminating against the individual in certain actions; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Care Facilities - Hospitals and Related Institutions - Discrimination Protections

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-03HouseHearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
2020-02-03HouseHearing canceled
2020-01-23HouseHearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-20HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB547 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-04 - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General19355(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback