MD HB254 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the maximum and mandatory minimum penalties for a person convicted of rape in the second degree of a child under the age of 13 years; and increasing the maximum and mandatory minimum penalties for a person convicted of sexual offense in the second degree against a child under the age of 13 years.
Title
Crimes - Sexual Offenses Against Children - Jessica's Law Enhancement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-09 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2010-04-09 | Senate Recede | |
2010-04-09 | Committee Amendment Withdrawn | |
2010-04-09 | Motion Recede (Senator Jacobs) Adopted | |
2010-04-06 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0) | |
2010-04-06 | Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Jacobs) Adopted | |
2010-04-06 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-10 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-03-23 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-04-09 | Returned Passed | |
2010-04-06 | Delegates Simmons, Anderson, and Carter | |
2010-04-06 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2010-04-06 | House Requests Senate Recede | |
2010-04-06 | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2010-03-21 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | |
2010-03-19 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-19 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-19 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | |
2010-01-29 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-25 | First Reading Judiciary |