MD HB251 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Board of Public Works to adopt regulations that include provisions that promote and facilitate the submission of all or part of specified applications for certification as a minority business enterprise through an electronic process.
Title
State Procurement - Minority Business Enterprises - Electronic Certification
Sponsors
Del. Elizabeth Bobo [D] | Del. Rudolph Cane [D] | Del. Jon Cardin [D] | Del. Frank Conaway [D] |
Del. Cheryl Glenn [D] | Del. Sue Hecht [D] | Del. Henry Heller [D] | Del. Dan Morhaim [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-03 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) | |
2010-04-02 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-08 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-04-03 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | |
2010-04-03 | House Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2010-03-05 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2010-03-03 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-03 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing 2/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-25 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Electronic Government
Licenses
Minorities
Procurement
Public Works, Board of
Rules and Regulations
Small Business
Transportation, Department of
Licenses
Minorities
Procurement
Public Works, Board of
Rules and Regulations
Small Business
Transportation, Department of