MD HB25 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1334
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-07 - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-07 - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to set certain goals for the number of inmates in rehabilitation programs and establish certain tracking systems; requiring the State Department of Education and the Department of Human Services to assist the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services in establishing certain tracking systems; and requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to assist inmates in accessing federal Pell Grants.
Title
Rehabilitation and Education for All Prisons (REAP) Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-07 | House | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2021-10-20 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB1334 (Carry Over) 2021-02-11 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Appropriations
Corrections
Data
Education
Education, State Department of
Grants
Human Services, Department of
Prisoners
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Rehabilitation
Rules and Regulations
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Corrections
Data
Education
Education, State Department of
Grants
Human Services, Department of
Prisoners
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Rehabilitation
Rules and Regulations
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Correctional Services | 2 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Correctional Services | 2 | 702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Correctional Services | 2 | 703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0025?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/hb/hb0025f.pdf |