MD HB248 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 459
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a recorded covenant or restriction, a provision in a declaration, or a provision in the bylaws or rules of a condominium or a homeowners association from prohibiting or unreasonably restricting a unit owner from contracting with a private entity to collect organic waste materials for composting and from prohibiting or unreasonably restricting a lot owner from composting organic waste materials for the lot owner's personal or household use as long as the lot owner owns or has the right to exclusive use of the composting area; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Rights and Restrictions - Composting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-30HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 459
2021-04-06HouseReturned Passed
2021-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2021-04-05SenateFavorable Adopted
2021-04-02SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2021-03-09SenateHearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-03-05SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2021-03-04HouseThird Reading Passed (124-0)
2021-03-02HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-02HouseFavorable with Amendments {660719/1 Adopted
2021-03-01HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-12-22HouseHearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2020-10-20HousePre-filed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Environment91701(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property11111.4(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property11B111.8(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback