MD HB244 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 313
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 313
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a person to petition the court to shield court records and police records relating to shieldable convictions no earlier than 3 years after the person satisfies the sentence or sentences imposed for all convictions for which shielding is requested; providing that, if a person is convicted of a new crime during a specified time period, the original conviction or convictions are not eligible for shielding unless the new conviction becomes eligible for shielding; providing that shielded records remain accessible to specified entities; etc.
Title
Maryland Second Chance Act of 2015
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (81-56) (Y: 81 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-04 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (McConkey) {853823/1 Rejected (45-90) (Y: 45 N: 90 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-04-04 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (McConkey) {723521/1 Rejected (51-81) (Y: 51 N: 81 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-04-04 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Howard01) {853723/1 Rejected (57-78) (Y: 57 N: 78 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-04-04 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Folden01) {573127/1 Rejected (60-78) (Y: 60 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-04-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (81-56) (Y: 81 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-04 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (McConkey) {853823/1 Rejected (45-90) (Y: 45 N: 90 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-04-04 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (McConkey) {723521/1 Rejected (51-81) (Y: 51 N: 81 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-04-04 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Howard01) {853723/1 Rejected (57-78) (Y: 57 N: 78 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-04-04 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Folden01) {573127/1 Rejected (60-78) (Y: 60 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 313 |
2015-04-13 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2015-04-13 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2015-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (81-56) |
2015-04-11 | House | Motion vote previous question (Delegate Vaughn) Adopted |
2015-04-11 | House | Special Order until later today (Delegate Krebs) Adopted |
2015-04-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-10 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate McConkey) {853823/1 Rejected (45-90) |
2015-04-10 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate McConkey) {723521/1 Rejected (51-81) |
2015-04-10 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate S. Howard) {853723/1 Rejected (57-78) |
2015-04-10 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Folden) {573127/1 Rejected (60-78) |
2015-04-10 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Anderson) {493221/1 Adopted |
2015-04-10 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Anderson) {523920/1 Adopted |
2015-04-10 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Anderson) {693229/1 Adopted |
2015-04-10 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Anderson) {663629/1 Adopted |
2015-04-10 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Buckel) {843820/2 Adopted |
2015-04-08 | House | Special Order until next session (Delegate Buckel) Adopted |
2015-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {752910/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2015-02-26 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Child Care
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Criminal Law - Procedure
Disclosure
Education
Electronic Government
Ex-Offenders
Health Occupations
Hearings
Higher Education
Law Enforcement
Licenses
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Petitions
Privacy
Public Employees
Public Officials
Records
Registration
State Employees
Victims
Work, Labor and Employment
Child Care
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Criminal Law - Procedure
Disclosure
Education
Electronic Government
Ex-Offenders
Health Occupations
Hearings
Higher Education
Law Enforcement
Licenses
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Petitions
Privacy
Public Employees
Public Officials
Records
Registration
State Employees
Victims
Work, Labor and Employment