MD HB240 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 28
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a person from threatening to commit certain hate crimes; and applying certain penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hate Crimes – Threats

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-2) (Y: 134 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 28
2019-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-11SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-08HouseThird Reading Passed (133-2)
2019-03-07HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-07HouseFavorable with Amendments {852217/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-06HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-01-24HouseHearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-24HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback