MD HB232 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 829
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Commissioner of Correction to submit a security and staffing report to the Secretary of Public Safety, the Governor, and the General Assembly on or before October 31, 2017, and on or before October 31 in every odd-numbered year thereafter; requiring the report to be based on a joint survey conducted by the administration of the Division of Correction and the exclusive collective bargaining representative of the employees; requiring the report to include specified information; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Correctional Services - Commissioner's Duties - Staffing Report

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-27HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 829
2017-03-31HouseReturned Passed
2017-03-31SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading Passed
2017-03-30SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2017-03-30SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2017-03-28SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-03-10SenateFirst Reading Finance
2017-03-09HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2017-03-07HouseSecond Reading Passed
2017-03-07HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2017-03-06HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2017-02-07HouseHearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-01-20HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback