MD HB225 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB391
Note: Carry Over of previous HB270
Note: Carry Over of previous HB270
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a certain assistant State's Attorney with knowledge of the case, to meet with a victim of sexually assaultive behavior or the victim's representative within 20 days after receiving a request from the victim regarding a decision by the Office of the State's Attorney to not file a charging document or dismiss charges against an alleged suspect; requiring the assistant State's Attorney, at the meeting, to explain the justification for a certain decision; and establishing certain requirements for the meeting.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victims of Sexually Assaultive Behavior
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Lewis Young [D] | Del. Lisa Belcastro [D] | Del. Catherine Forbes [D] | Del. Ken Kerr [D] |
Del. Susan McComas [R] | Del. Kirill Reznik [D] | Del. Sheila Ruth [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-7) |
2022-03-15 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-14 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2022-01-14 | House | Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB225 (Carry Over) 2022-03-16 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
HB270 (Carry Over) 2021-03-18 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
SB300 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-09 - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
HB270 (Carry Over) 2021-03-18 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
SB300 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-09 - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Procedure | 11 | 1009 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |