MD HB224 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-12 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-12 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing provisions of law establishing the Small, Minority-Owned, and Women-Owned Business Sports Wagering Assistance Fund.
Title
Sports Wagering - Sports Wagering Assistance Fund - Repeal
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2024-01-05 | House | Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2023-09-11 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB272 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-05 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 9 | 1E-07 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 1E-16 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |