MD HB224 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-29 - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring certain taxpayers to add a certain deduction for gains from sales or exchanges of qualified opportunity zone property back to federal adjusted gross income to determine Maryland adjusted gross income; requiring certain taxpayers to add a certain deduction for gains from sales or exchanges of qualified opportunity zone property back to federal adjusted gross income to determine Maryland modified income; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Opportunity Zone Tax Deduction Reform Act of 2020

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-29HouseHearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-29HouseHearing canceled
2020-01-24HouseHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-16HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SB263 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-28 - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Tax - General10204(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General10305(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback