MD HB223 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing in Garrett County the holder of a special Class C beer, wine and liquor license to purchase beer and light wine from a wholesale dealer.
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Class C Beer, Wine and Liquor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | |
2012-03-27 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-26 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-26 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-03-16 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-03-29 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-15 | Third Reading Passed (134-0) | |
2012-03-13 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-13 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-12 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-01-31 | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-26 | First Reading Economic Matters |