MD HB221 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-12 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-12 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering certain definitions relating to student enrollment that are generally used for the calculation of funding for general education programs.
Title
Education - Funding for General Education Programs - Definition Alterations
Sponsors
Del. Chao Wu [D] | Del. Todd Morgan [R] | Del. Gary Simmons [D] | Del. Jen Terrasa [D] |
Del. Natalie Ziegler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2024-01-05 | House | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2023-10-06 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB385 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-18 - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 5 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 239 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |